LM Insurance Corporation v. Rockhill Investment Trust et al
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Rockhill Investment Trust, Swift Staffing Alabama, LLC, Swift Staffing Georgia, LLC, Swift Staffing Mississippi, LLC and Rockhill Staffing Mississippi, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00039
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/3/20. (jla)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of LM Insurance Corporation against Rockhill Staffing Mississippi, LLC in the amount of $107,218, to accrue interest at the current federal rate from the date of judgment until satisfied. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 7/24/18. (jla)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Default Judgment; plaintiff shall submit affidavits and declarations addressing damages within 14 days. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 7/10/18. (jla)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 135 Order on Motion to Sever. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 6/12/18. (jla)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 124 Order on Motion to Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 02/22/2018. (mga)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/8/17. (rel)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 21 Default Judgment,. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 11/10/16. (rel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LM Insurance Corporation v. Rockhill Investment Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: David E. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockhill Investment Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Staffing Alabama, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Staffing Georgia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Staffing Mississippi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockhill Staffing Mississippi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?