Metrolis v. Mugshots Tupelo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Julie Metrolis
Defendant: Mugshots Tupelo, LLC and Ain't Life Grand Investments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00109
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AGREED ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/26/17. (dbm)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by reason of settlement. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/23/2017. (dbm)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/28/2016.(dbm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metrolis v. Mugshots Tupelo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Metrolis
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mugshots Tupelo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ain't Life Grand Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?