Royal v. Boykin et al
Plaintiff: Paul N. Royal
Defendant: Canyon Boykin, Johnny Branch, Yolanda Young, Garrett Mittan, John Does I-X, Tony Carleton and City of Columbus, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2016cv00176
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 299 Motion to Produce Certain Deposition Transcripts and Exhibits to the Attorney General's Office in Pending Criminal Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/14/18. (cs)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting 297 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing cause with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/10/18. (jla)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice of individual defendant Tony Carleton, Tony Carleton (Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of Police of The Columbus Police Department) terminated.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/28/18. (jla)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER MODIFYING 150 Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/25/18. (cs)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 121 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/5/17. (jla)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER finding as moot 56 Motion for Discovery; finding as moot 64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 85 Motion to Withdraw ; granting 86 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/6/17. (rel)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Continue; granting 43 Motion Continue;require specific reply. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/4/17. (rel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal v. Boykin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul N. Royal
Represented By: Andrew C. Clarke
Represented By: Derrick T. Simmons
Represented By: Errick D. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Boykin
Represented By: Jeffery P. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Branch
Represented By: John Richard Barry
Represented By: James C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Young
Represented By: John Richard Barry
Represented By: James C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Mittan
Represented By: John Richard Barry
Represented By: James C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Carleton
Represented By: Katherine S. Kerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus, Mississippi
Represented By: Katherine S. Kerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?