Roop v. Itawamba County et al
Plaintiff: Milford Lee Roop
Defendant: Itawamba County, Chris Dickinson and Itawamba County Jail Jailers
Case Number: 1:2017cv00024
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Itawamba
Presiding Judge: Neal B. Biggers
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 4/13/18. (cr)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 45 Motion for Immediate Release. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/6/18. (jla)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order Extending the Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to the Defendants Motion 48 for Summary Judgment filed by Itawamba County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/1/18. (cr)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 42 Motion for Release from Prison. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 1/4/18. (jla)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER dismissing 16 Motion for Release from Prison for Release; dismissing 18 Motion for Release; dismissing 24 Motion for immediate release; directing Clerk to provide plaintiff with a proper 2254 form and IFP form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/11/17. (jla) Modified on 9/11/2017 (jla).
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROCESS ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/23/17. (rel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roop v. Itawamba County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milford Lee Roop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itawamba County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itawamba County Jail Jailers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?