McRaney v. The North American Mission Board of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc.

Plaintiff: Will McRaney
Defendant: The North American Mission Board of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00080
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Referring Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER converting 48 to a Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING same; finding as moot 56 Motion to Strike, CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 4/22/19. (jla)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 37 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/7/18. (jcm)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 22 Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 02/22/2018. (mga)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 18 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/18/18. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRaney v. The North American Mission Board of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will McRaney
Represented By: W. Harvey Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The North American Mission Board of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen I. Carrington
Represented By: Joshua J. Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?