Nabors v. Malone
Plaintiff: Malinda Nabors
Defendant: Pete Malone
Case Number: 1:2017cv00164
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/26/19. (jcm)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/30/18. (jla)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 20 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/9/2018. (dbm)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/18/17. (jcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nabors v. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Nabors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?