Kleckner v. Mills
Petitioner: Jeffrey Kleckner
Respondent: Andrew Mills
Case Number: 1:2017cv00208
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/18/18. (cr)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Andrew Mills answer due 2/16/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/8/17. (cr)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Ordered that this petition for habeas relief is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi and that the petition and other pleadings filed in this civil action will be received in accordance with the orders and local rules of that Court and any applicable statute or law. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 12/4/17. (RLW) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/6/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kleckner v. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Kleckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Mills
Represented By: Jim Hood
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?