Faith Forestry Services, Inc. v. United States Department of Labor et al
Plaintiff: Faith Forestry Services, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Labor and Alexander Acosta
Case Number: 1:2017cv00214
Filed: December 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Alcorn
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing case. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/1/2018. (dbm)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 36 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/19/2018. (dbm)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on BRIEFING re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/24/2018. (dbm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faith Forestry Services, Inc. v. United States Department of Labor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Forestry Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Lynn Carpenter, Jr.
Represented By: Wendel V. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Stuart Davis
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: Samuel P. Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Stuart Davis
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: Samuel P. Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?