BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Montana Farms LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Montana Farms LLC, Alonzo Sykes, Angelena Cook and Terry McIntosh
Case Number: 1:2018cv00014
Filed: January 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 56 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/2/2018. (adm)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TRO. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/6/2018. (adm)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TRO re 27 Order on Motion for Reconsideration on TRO. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/2/2018. (adm)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Notice of hearing on remaining motions will be refiled by separate order. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/16/2018. (adm)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion for TRO; deferring ruling on 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/7/2017. (adm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Montana Farms LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: William R. Armstrong, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Farms LLC
Represented By: Brian Kelly Herrington
Represented By: James Brandon Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelena Cook
Represented By: Brian Kelly Herrington
Represented By: James Brandon Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry McIntosh
Represented By: Brian Kelly Herrington
Represented By: James Brandon Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?