Harris v. Clay County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Harris
Defendant: Forrest Allgood, Honorable Lee Howard, John Does 1-5, Honorable James Kitchens, Kenneth Burns, Eddie Scott, Clay County, Mississippi, Special Master Doe, Laddie Huffman, Pearson Lidell, Jr., Thad Buck, RN Tanya West, Nancy Stuart and Edwin C. LeGrand, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv00167
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Nancy Stuart. (cr)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Clay County, Mississippi; Laddie Huffman; Eddie Scott; Tanya West; and Thad Buck (jla)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Edwin C. LeGrand, III; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Edwin C. LeGrand, III. (Moore, Carlos)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Rachel Harris Nancy Stuart served on 10/13/2018. (Moore, Carlos)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Pearson Lidell, Jr. (Moore, Carlos)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Forrest Allgood. (Moore, Carlos)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/03/18. (tab)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Thad Buck, Edwin C. LeGrand, III, Pearson Lidell, Jr, Nancy Stuart, Tanya West; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Forrest Allgood, Clay County, Mississippi, Laddie Huffman, John Does 1-5, Eddie Scott, Special Master Doe, Edwin C LeGrand, III, Tanya West, Thad Buck, Nancy Stuart, Pearson Lidell, Jr, Jury Demand, filed by Rachel Harris. (Moore, Carlos)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Carr on behalf of Rachel Harris (Carr, Michael)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tina M. Bullock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bullock, Tina)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Forrest Allgood, Kenneth Burns, Clay County, Mississippi, Lee Howard, Laddie Huffman, James Kitchens, Eddie Scott; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1591381, filed by Rachel Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Clay County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Harris
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Represented By: Michael S. Carr
Represented By: Tina M. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Allgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Lee Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable James Kitchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Master Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laddie Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearson Lidell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thad Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Tanya West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin C. LeGrand, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?