Jones v. Booth et al
Plaintiff: Morkiter Jones
Defendant: Unknown Defendants A-Z, Jared Booth and City of Columbus, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2018cv00193
Filed: November 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by City of Columbus, Mississippi. (Turnage, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jared Booth. (Morris, Bradford)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradford Keith Morris on behalf of Morkiter Jones City of Columbus, Mississippi served on 12/5/2018. (Morris, Bradford)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Jared Booth and City of Columbus, Mississippi (jla)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jared Booth, City of Columbus, Mississippi; returned via USPS. (jla)
November 5, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
November 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1612949, filed by Morkiter Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibit B - Media Accounts of Incident, #3 Exhibit C - City Counsel Minutes, #4 Exhibit D - Media Account of Suspension, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Booth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus, Mississippi
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morkiter Jones
Represented By: Bradford Keith Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?