Rush v. Carmax et al
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Defendant: Allied Solutions, LLC, American Credit Acceptance and Carmax
Case Number: 1:2018cv00210
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Pro Se Consent & Registration to Receive Documents Electronically (jtm)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Pro/Bono or Conservatorship. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/21/18. (bnd)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Bono or Conservatorship by Zorri N. Rush. (jtm)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zorri N. Rush. (jtm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Carmax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Credit Acceptance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?