Easley v. Lowndes County, Mississippi

Plaintiff: Charles D. Easley, Jr.
Defendant: Lowndes County, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2018cv00223
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis H. Watson, Jr on behalf of Charles D. Easley, Jr Lowndes County, Mississippi served on 1/11/2019. (Watson, Louis)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Lowndes County, Mississippi (jla)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Charles D. Easley, Jr (Norris, Robert)
December 3, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lowndes County, Mississippi; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1621791, filed by Charles D. Easley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easley v. Lowndes County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowndes County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D. Easley, Jr.
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?