Sanderson v. Alcorn Co. Dept. of Human Services et al
Plaintiff: John Sanderson, Jr.
Defendant: Alcorn Co. Dept. of Human Services, Ryan Toms, Barbara Proctor, Judge Richard Bowen, Prentiss Co. Health Dept., Cindy Lambert, Debi Gann and Miss Dept of Human Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv00230
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #6 Order. (cr)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO THE COURT'S SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Due date - 2/18/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/28/19. (cr)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE INSTANT CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/23/19. (cr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #3 Order. (cr)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Seal complaint re #1 Sealed Document filed by John Sanderson, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/11/18. (cr)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (cr)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Sanderson, Jr. (cr)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Sealed Document - Complaint filed by John Sanderson Jr. (cr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderson v. Alcorn Co. Dept. of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcorn Co. Dept. of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Toms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Richard Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prentiss Co. Health Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debi Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Dept of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sanderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?