Rush v. Eye Clinics of Eupora

Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Defendant: Eye Clinics of Eupora
Case Number: 1:2019cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Glen H Davidson
1 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H. Davidson and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00856. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 2, 2019 District Transfer Out to the District of Northern District of Mississippi (MGB) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 1/3/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE Northern District of Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 1/2/19 (MGB) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 1/3/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Zorri N. Rush (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope - addressed to Gulfport)(Copy distributed to Operations Clerk)(MGB) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 1/3/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zorri N. Rush (MGB) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 1/3/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eye Clinics of Eupora, filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(MGB) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 1/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Eye Clinics of Eupora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eye Clinics of Eupora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?