Baird v. Crosthwait
Appellee: Allen E. Crosthwait
Appellant: David E. Baird
Case Number: 1:2019cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 RECEIVED DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal; placed on shelf, clerk's office Oxford (tab)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record for Appellee by U. S. Bankruptcy Court. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Howell, Amanda)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by David E. Baird. (Sanderson, Rex)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBITS -TRIAL/HEARING from US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1, #2 Exhibit P-2, #3 Exhibit P-3, #4 Exhibit P-4, #5 Exhibit P-5, #6 Exhibit P-6, #7 Exhibit P-7, #8 Exhibit P-8, #9 Exhibit P-9, #10 Exhibit P-10, #11 Exhibit P-14, #12 Exhibit P-15) (jla)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Allen E. Crosthwait. (Geno, Craig)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record for Appellant by U. S. Bankruptcy Court. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Howell, Amanda)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases United States Bankruptcy Court Appeal Cases No. 1:18-CV-00225-MPM and 1:19-CV-00003-MPM by David E. Baird. (Sanderson, Rex)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Transmittal of Unperfected Record on Appeal to District Court. Case No. 1:19-cv-3-MPM. Assigned to Judge Michael P. Mills. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Howell, Amanda)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills (jla)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Denying Motion to Amend Final Judgment to Determine Interest Thereon and to Determine Prejudgment Interest and Lift the Stay. Signed by Judge Jason D. Woodard on 12/19/18. (Howell, Amanda)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 05-01089-JDW. File received, filed by David E. Baird. Appellant Brief due by 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet) (Howell, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baird v. Crosthwait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Allen E. Crosthwait
Represented By: Craig M. Geno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David E. Baird
Represented By: Rex F. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?