Smith v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Joyce Ann Smith
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation, Diversity Vuteq, LLC and Rochelle Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00006
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Staying Discovery pending resolution of Jurisdictional motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/22/19. (jcm)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Responses now due by 3/19/2019. No further written order will issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/19/2019. (no document attached) (kab)
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Joyce Ann Smith. (Jones, Bennie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Jones, William)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Jones, William)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Jones, William)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses now due by 3/18/2019. No further written order will issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/13/2019. (no document attached) (kab) Modified on 2/13/2019 (mrt).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Attorney Russell W. Jackson; granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Nicole Bermel Dunlap terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/12/19. (jcm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Memorandum in Support, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joyce Ann Smith. (Jones, Bennie)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bennie L. Jones, Jr on behalf of Joyce Ann Smith (Jones, Bennie) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jwr).
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Diversity Vuteq, LLC. (Dunlap, Nicole)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney RUSSELL W. JACKSON, ESQ.,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1642810) by Diversity Vuteq, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate) (Ehrhardt, Wesley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wesley D. Ehrhardt on behalf of Diversity Vuteq, LLC (Ehrhardt, Wesley)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Dunlap, Nicole)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Diversity Vuteq, LLC. (Dunlap, Nicole)
February 1, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 Memorandum in Support; Attorney requests to refile documents, incorrect documents filed (jla)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Dunlap, Nicole)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Diversity Vuteq, LLC. (Dunlap, Nicole)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jtm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Diversity Vuteq, LLC, Rochelle Doe, Toyota Motor Corporation. Handed to plaintiff for service. (jtm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300023358, filed by Joyce Ann Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Represented By: William Easom Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversity Vuteq, LLC
Represented By: Wesley D. Ehrhardt
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Represented By: Nicole Bermel Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Ann Smith
Represented By: Bennie L. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?