Hoggatt et al v. Allstate Insurance et al

Plaintiff: Eric Hoggatt, DDS, Plaintiffs 20-40, Ethan Hoggatt and Plaintiffs 3-29
Defendant: Mr. Homan, Andy Dyson, Mrs. Homan, Mrs. Hand, Homans Garage and Allstate Insurance
Case Number: 1:2019cv00014
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #23 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Eric Hoggatt, DDS.. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 3/13/2019. (spw)
March 4, 2019 Filing 28 JOINDER re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, #27 Memorandum in Support re #23 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Embry, Harry) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jla).
March 4, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #23 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allstate Insurance. (Cowan, Charles)
March 4, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION : Disregard filing, attorney to re-file #26 Memorandum in Support (cr)
March 1, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION Disregard filing, attorney to re-file re #25 Memorandum in Support (tab)
March 1, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Cowan, Charles)
March 1, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Cowan, Charles)
March 1, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allstate Insurance. (Cowan, Charles)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Eric Hoggatt, DDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit January16, 2019 overnight letter from Allstate Corporate Counsel Yesha Hoeppner, from Northbrook Illinois, #2 Exhibit January16, 2019, Defendant Allstate Insurances Joinder and Consent to Removal, signed by Charles Cowan, Mississippi Bar #104478) (Hoggatt, Victoria)
February 20, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION Motion filed contains two reliefs; attorney requested to re-file as separate, distinct motions See Local Rule 7(2)(A) re #22 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court Circuit Court of Monroe County, Mississippi (tab)
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court Circuit Court of Monroe County, Mississippi by Eric Hoggatt, DDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wise Carter, representing Allstate InsuranceCowan and Radicioni, #2 Exhibit Allstate Corporate Litigation Counsel) (Hoggatt, Victoria)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacob Christian Ladnier terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/19/19. (jcm)
February 19, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint - State Court, Counterclaim by Ethan Hoggatt. (Hoggatt, Victoria)
February 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mrs. Hand. (Ladnier, Jacob)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Roechelle R. Morgan and Bertis Wayne Williams terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/6/19. (jcm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andy Dyson. (Morgan, Roechelle)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Christian Ladnier on behalf of Suzanne Hand (Ladnier, Jacob)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/23/19. (jtm)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roechelle R. Morgan on behalf of Andy Dyson (Morgan, Roechelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bertis Wayne Williams on behalf of Andy Dyson (Williams, Bertis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Defendant Andy Dyson d/b/a Dyson Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Embry, Harry)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Andy Dyson, Mrs. Hand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Policy) (Embry, Harry)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Eric Hoggatt, DDS, Ethan Hoggatt by Mr. Homan, Mrs. Homan, Homans Garage. (Pharr, Tiffany)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, on Behalf of Sibyl Homan, Clifton Homan, and Homans' Garage. (Pharr, Tiffany)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany K. Pharr on behalf of Mr. Homan, Mrs. Homan, Homans Garage (Pharr, Tiffany)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt, #5 Summons Andy Dyson, #6 Summons Allstate, #7 Summons Mrs. Hand, #8 Summons Homans Garage, #9 Summons Mrs. Homan, #10 Summons Mr. Homan, #11 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Embry, Harry)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Radicioni, Cory)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Allstate Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy) (Radicioni, Cory)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, on Behalf of Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Cowan, Charles)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay Marshall Atkins on behalf of Andy Dyson, Mrs. Hand (Atkins, Jay)
January 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eric Hoggatt, DDS, Plaintiffs 20-40, Ethan Hoggatt, Plaintiffs 3-29. (jla)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mrs. Hand, Andy Dyson from Monroe County Circuit Court, case number CV2018-422-GM. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1634741) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Mrs. Hand, Andy Dyson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certified State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoggatt et al v. Allstate Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Homan
Represented By: Tiffany K. Pharr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Dyson
Represented By: Harry Case Embry
Represented By: Bertis Wayne Williams
Represented By: Roechelle R. Morgan
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Homan
Represented By: Tiffany K. Pharr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Hand
Represented By: Harry Case Embry
Represented By: Jacob Christian Ladnier
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homans Garage
Represented By: Tiffany K. Pharr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance
Represented By: Cory L. Radicioni
Represented By: Charles E. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hoggatt, DDS
Represented By: Victoria Jean Johnson Hoggatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs 20-40
Represented By: Victoria Jean Johnson Hoggatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Hoggatt
Represented By: Victoria Jean Johnson Hoggatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs 3-29
Represented By: Victoria Jean Johnson Hoggatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?