Willis v. Seminole Furniture, LLC

Plaintiff: Christy Willis
Defendant: Seminole Furniture, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00036
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Glen H Davidson
1 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 4/25/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/3/19. (jcm)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Seminole Furniture, LLC. (Brandon, Stephen)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Christy Willis Seminole Furniture, LLC served on 2/18/2019. (Waide, Jim)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Seminole Furniture, LLC answer due 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/14/19. (jcm)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Seminole Furniture, LLC. (Brandon, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Seminole Furniture, LLC. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1645663, filed by Christy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B: Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Seminole Furniture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Willis
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole Furniture, LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?