Rush v. Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis

Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush and Zorri N. Rush (DO NOT FILE)
Defendant: Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00057
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/30/19. (jtm)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Sharion Aycock: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2019 re #2 filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Court Reporter Phyllis McLarty.) (mrt)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Motion Hearing - set for 4/17/2019 - 02:30 PM - in Oxford Courtroom 2 - before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (mrt)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/21/19. (jtm)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/14/19. (jtm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00137. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this action to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 3/1/2019 (VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/6/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent and Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/6/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zorri N. Rush (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/21/2019) (cwl).[Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/6/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis, filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2019: #2 Envelope Envelope) (cwl). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush (DO NOT FILE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?