Moore v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Moore
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Employee Doe(s)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00066
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion re #15 MOTION for Discovery (Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion to stay discovery) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hubbard, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/4/2019 (jla).
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Discovery filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 05.07.2019 - Letter from Wal-Mart's counsel to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Documents, #3 Exhibit 05.14.2019 - Letter from Wal-Mart's counsel to Plaintiff) (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion re #13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hubbard, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/4/2019 (jla).
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey P. Hubbard in Support of Motion for Discovery Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(D)) (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Discovery (Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion to stay discovery) by Tracy Moore. (cr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (cr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Tracy Moore. (cr)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Tracy Moore to Walmart Stores East LP. (jla)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE STATEMENT OF WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 4/1/2019. (jwr)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cr)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacey Suiter Strain on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Strain, Stacey)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey P. Hubbard on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (edc)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/25/19. (jcm)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tracy Moore. (jla)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand,, filed by Tracy Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey Suiter Strain
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?