Brown v. Atsumi et al

Plaintiff: John Brown
Defendant: Kazuma Atsumi, Vuteq USA, Inc. and John Does 1-9
Case Number: 1:2019cv00069
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Resetting Conference: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET for 7/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jf)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/10/2019. (jf)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Request for Production by Julia Bryant Jimenez on behalf of Kazuma Atsumi, Vuteq USA, Inc.. (Jimenez, Julia)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE STATEMENT Vuteq USA, Inc.. (Jimenez, Julia)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Julia Bryant Jimenez on behalf of Kazuma Atsumi. (Jimenez, Julia)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Julia Bryant Jimenez on behalf of Kazuma Atsumi, Vuteq USA, Inc.. (Jimenez, Julia)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set for Admissions by Julia Bryant Jimenez on behalf of Kazuma Atsumi. (Jimenez, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Kazuma Atsumi, Vuteq USA, Inc.. (Jimenez, Julia)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service, #3 Summons Summons to Atsumi, #4 State Court Complaint Amended Complaint, #5 Summons Alias Summons to Atsumi, #6 Summons Summons to Vuteq, #7 State Court Complaint Second Amended Complaint, #8 Summons Summons to Atsumi, #9 Summons Alias Summons to Atsumi, #10 Exhibit Notice of Removal) (Jimenez, Julia)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert F. Stacy, Jr on behalf of Kazuma Atsumi, Vuteq USA, Inc. (Stacy, Robert)
April 9, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Brown. (jwr)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kazuma Atsumi, Vuteq USA, Inc. from Lee County Circuit Court, case number CV19-008. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number MSN300023862) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Kazuma Atsumi, Vuteq USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Atsumi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brown
Represented By: Casey Langston Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kazuma Atsumi
Represented By: Julia Bryant Jimenez
Represented By: Robert F. Stacy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vuteq USA, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Bryant Jimenez
Represented By: Robert F. Stacy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?