Humphries et al v. Interstate Realty Management Company

Plaintiff: Latonya Humphries and Leah Wick
Defendant: Interstate Realty Management Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00070
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant's ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Interstate Realty Management Company. (Barron, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Sarah Foster (Sally) Barron on behalf of Interstate Realty Management Company to Plaintiff. (Barron, Sarah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Unopposed) against Interstate Realty Management Company, Jury Demand, filed by Latonya Humphries, Leah Wick. (McLaughlin, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/13/19. (bnd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Jury Trial by Leah Wick. (McLaughlin, Richard)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court by Latonya Humphries, Leah Wick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed First Amended Complaint)) (McLaughlin, Richard)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (McLaughlin, Richard)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for November 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/12/19. (rtc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 10/31/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 12/2/2019. Motions due by 2/21/2020. Settlement Conference set for 11/20/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/12/19. (rtc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 6/12/2019. (rtc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Latonya Humphries, Leah Wick to Defendant Interstate Realty Management Company. (McLaughlin, Richard)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE Resetting Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 6/12/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (bnd)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference RESET for 6/10/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL. Attorney James D. Moore terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/29/19. (jtm)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McLaughlin, Richard)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Barron, Sarah)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Interstate Realty Management Company. (Barron, Sarah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Alan Cowart on behalf of Interstate Realty Management Company (Cowart, Craig)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/11/19. (rtc)
April 11, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Interstate Realty Management Company, filed by Latonya Humphries, Leah Wick. (jla)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Interstate Realty Management Company from Lee County Circuit Court, case number CV19-007(W)(L). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1666323) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Interstate Realty Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphries et al v. Interstate Realty Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya Humphries
Represented By: James D. Moore
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Wick
Represented By: James D. Moore
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Realty Management Company
Represented By: Sarah Foster (Sally) Barron
Represented By: Craig Alan Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?