Jackson v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Codie Jackson
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00090
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Remark; Transferred Case has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 3:19-cv-01551 (jla)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Case Transferred to District of Northern Florida. Case Transferred via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER; MDL Case Transferred to District of Northern Florida. (jla) Modified on 5/28/2019 (jla).
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Langston Lott on behalf of Codie Jackson 3M Company served on 5/10/2019. (Lott, Casey)
May 3, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 3M Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1674786, filed by Codie Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Codie Jackson
Represented By: Casey Langston Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?