Chambers v. Green-Stubbs et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Chambers
Defendant: Stefany's Vocal & Performance Training Studios, LLC and Stephanie Green-Stubbs
Case Number: 1:2019cv00093
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephan L. McDavid on behalf of Patricia Chambers Stefany's Vocal & Performance Training Studios, LLC served on 7/10/2019. (McDavid, Stephan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephan L. McDavid on behalf of Patricia Chambers Stephanie Green-Stubbs served on 7/10/2019. (McDavid, Stephan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Stephanie Green-Stubbs and Stefany's Vocal & Performance Training Studios, LLC (jla)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Remark: Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright forwarded to Register of Copyrights. (jwr)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1677924, filed by Patricia Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: Notarized Lyric Sheet, #3 Exhibit B: Facebook Admissions, #4 Exhibit C: Certificate of Registration, #5 Exhibit D: Cease and Desist Letter) (jwr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Green-Stubbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Chambers
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefany's Vocal & Performance Training Studios, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Green-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?