Wickes v. Commissioner of Social Security et al

Plaintiff: William Stanley Wickes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00097
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/22/2019. (jwr)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/22/19. (bnd)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Karl Osterhout,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1680791) by William Stanley Wickes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Karl Osterhout, #2 Supplement Supplemental List of Court Admissions) (Garrison, Franklin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to USM for service. (jwr)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/17/19. (bnd)
May 16, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Stanley Wickes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Costs) (tab)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by William Stanley Wickes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wickes v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stanley Wickes
Represented By: Franklin Alan Garrison
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?