Edwards v. Alcorn County, Mississippi

Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Edwards
Defendant: Alcorn County, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2019cv00103
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Arnulfo Ursua Luciano on behalf of Alcorn County, Mississippi of Intent of SDT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Subpoena Duces Tecum to Belk, Inc.) (Luciano, Arnulfo)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 8/6/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/20/19. (rtc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alcorn County, Mississippi. (Luciano, Arnulfo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arnulfo Ursua Luciano on behalf of Alcorn County, Mississippi (Luciano, Arnulfo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Alcorn County, Mississippi (Griffith, Daniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Jennifer Lynn Edwards Alcorn County, Mississippi served on 6/3/2019. (McLaughlin, Richard)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/23/19. (jla)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alcorn County, Mississippi; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1682082, filed by Jennifer Lynn Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Alcorn County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcorn County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Arnulfo Ursua Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Edwards
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?