Qadous v. White et al

Plaintiff: Khalil Qadous
Defendant: Safeco Insurance, Shonda White and John Does I-V
Case Number: 1:2019cv00111
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Shonda White (jla)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Clerk, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons (Shonda White) 12.11.18, #4 Amended Complaint, #5 Motion for Time to Serve Process, #6 Order Allowing Time to Serve Process, #7 Summons (Shonda White) 05.03.19, #8 Summons (Safeco-CSC), #9 Summons (Safeco - MS Ins. Commissioner), #10 Notice to Clerk of Filing Notice of Removal) (Caraway, Gregg)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance. (Caraway, Gregg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Safeco Insurance (Caraway, Gregg)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Does I-V, Safeco Insurance, Shonda White, filed by Khalil Qadous. (tab)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance from County Court of Lee County, Mississippi, case number CV2018-001521. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number -537-1686552) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Safeco Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Process, Pleadings and Orders Served, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qadous v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance
Represented By: Gregg A. Caraway
Represented By: Clint D. Vanderver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonda White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalil Qadous
Represented By: Clinton L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?