Haynes et al v. Dollar General et al

Plaintiff: Ollie Haynes and John Does I-V
Defendant: Dollar General
Case Number: 1:2019cv00116
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Remand Letter. (tab)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/29/19. (jla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ollie Haynes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit affidavit) (Hosford, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 8/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/9/2019. (jf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint) (Roberts, Ronald)
June 20, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 (jla)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Roberts, Ronald)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Dollar General. (Roberts, Ronald)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Dollar General, John Does I-V, filed by Ollie Haynes. (tab)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar General from Circuit Court of Winston County, Mississippi, case number 2019-034-CVL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1689340) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Dollar General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint/Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes et al v. Dollar General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Haynes
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hosford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General
Represented By: Ronald L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?