First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716 et al
Plaintiff: First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc.
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716 and U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00120
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Paul L. Fields, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/6/19. (bnd)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Stephen A. Kahn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/6/19. (bnd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #26 Response in Support of Motion to Remand. (Margolis, Alicia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 26 Response to #16 Response in Opposition to #11 Motion to Remand. (Margolis, Alicia) Modified on 8/5/2019 to link to motion (jwr).
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 EXHIBIT re #23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Stephen A. Kahn,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1704776) Certificate of Good Standing from Michigan. (Johnson, Whitman)
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 EXHIBIT re #23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Stephen A. Kahn,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1704776) Certificate of Good Standing from Alabama. (Johnson, Whitman)
August 1, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Stephen A. Kahn,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1704776); requested Attorney Johnson file Certificate of Good Standing from Michigan and Alabama (jla)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Stephen A. Kahn,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1704776) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Stephen Kahn) (Johnson, Whitman)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Paul L. Fields, Jr.,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1704755) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Paul Fields, Jr.) (Johnson, Whitman)
July 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 8/2/2019 (jla)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Replies due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 07/23/2019. (mga)
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc.. (Margolis, Alicia) Modified on 7/24/2019 (jla).
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #18 Response in Support of Motion, re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Johnson, Whitman) Modified on 7/22/2019 (jla).
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Johnson, Whitman)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Johnson, Whitman) Modified on 7/22/2019 (jla).
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Johnson, Whitman)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/17/19. (bnd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc.. (Margolis, Alicia) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jla).
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc.. (Margolis, Alicia)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc.. (Margolis, Alicia)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Insurers July 19 2019 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Letters to Fields Howell, #5 Exhibit E - Letters from City and Mitchell McNutt, #6 Exhibit F - Letters from Adjuster and Code Solutions Group, #7 Exhibit G - Miss. DOI Guidelines) (Margolis, Alicia)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/25/19. (jla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Return - Beazley Syndicate, #4 Summons Return - Torus Syndicate, #5 Summons Return - Apollo Syndicate, #6 Summons Return - Amtrust Syndicate, #7 Summons Return - Talbot Syndicate, #8 Summons Return - MSF Pritchard Syndicate, #9 Summons Return - Channel Syndicate, #10 Summons Return - Advent Syndicate, #11 Summons Return - WR Berkley Syndicate, #12 Summons Return - US Specialty) (Johnson, Whitman)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time (until 7/14/19 - falls on a Sunday) to File a Response re #4 MOTION to Compel. Responses now due by 7/15/2019. No further written order will issue from this Court. (no document attached) Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/25/2019. (dbm) Modified on 6/26/2019 (jla).
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Alexander Purvis on behalf of First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc. (Purvis, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc.. (Margolis, Alicia)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 7/29/19 re #6 Order Staying Case (rtc)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE DUE TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/18/19. (bnd)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Johnson, Whitman)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advent's Certificate of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit B - W.R. Berkley's Certificate of Incorporation, #3 Exhibit C - Beazley's Certificate of Incorporation, #4 Exhibit D - Apollo's Certificate of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit E - Policy No. PG0197716 (redacted), #6 Exhibit F - Hon. Alex Purvis' 2-22-19 letter, #7 Exhibit G - arbitration demand letter, #8 Exhibit H - Plaintiff's arbitration rejection letter, #9 Exhibit I - arbitration selection letter) (Johnson, Whitman)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/17/19. (rtc)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, filed by First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc. (jwr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Alcorn County, case number CV2019-121. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1689985) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court File, #2 Exhibit B: Policy (redacted), #3 Exhibit C: Advent's Certificate of Incorporation, #4 Exhibit D: W.R. Berkley's Certificate of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit E: Beazley's Certificate of Incorporation, #6 Exhibit F: Apollo's Certificate of Incorporation, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First United Methodist Church of Corinth, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Kate Margolis
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. PG197716
Represented By: Whitman B. Johnson, III
Represented By: Paul L. Fields, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen A. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Whitman B. Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?