Robinson v. Webster County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Felicia Robinson
Defendant: Santana Townsend, Tim Mitchell, John Does 1-30, Webster County, Mississippi, Webster County Sheriff's Department and Daren Patterson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00121
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Dismissing All Federal and State Claims filed by Webster County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Dismissing All Federal and State Claims by Webster County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Dismissing Under State Law Claims filed by Webster County Sheriff's Department. (Griffith, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Dismissing Under State Law Claims by Webster County Sheriff's Department. (Griffith, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #18 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Dismissing Duplicate Official Capacity Claims (Mitchell & Townsend - Officially) filed by Tim Mitchell, Santana Townsend, Webster County Sheriff's Department, Webster County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Dismissing Duplicate Official Capacity Claims (Mitchell & Townsend - Officially) by Tim Mitchell, Santana Townsend, Webster County Sheriff's Department, Webster County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (Mitchell & Townsend in their duplicate official capacities only) by Tim Mitchell, Santana Townsend, Webster County Sheriff's Department, Webster County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Daren Patterson (jla)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default against Daren Patterson by Felicia Robinson. (Wilson, Matthew)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tim Mitchell answer due 8/12/2019; Santana Townsend answer due 8/12/2019; Webster County Sheriff's Department answer due 8/12/2019; Webster County, Mississippi answer due 8/12/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/16/19. (def)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Felicia Robinson by Santana Townsend (filed Pro Se). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (jwr)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Mitchell (Officially) & Townsend (Officially) by Tim Mitchell, Santana Townsend, Webster County Sheriff's Department, Webster County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica S. Malone on behalf of Tim Mitchell, Santana Townsend (Malone, Jessica)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Allen on behalf of Tim Mitchell, Santana Townsend (Allen, William)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Tim Mitchell, Santana Townsend, Webster County Sheriff's Department, Webster County, Mississippi (Griffith, Mary)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Tim Mitchell, Santana Townsend, Webster County Sheriff's Department, Webster County, Mississippi (Griffith, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of Felicia Robinson Daren Patterson served on 6/20/2019. (Wilson, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of Felicia Robinson Tim Mitchell served on 6/20/2019. (Wilson, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of Felicia Robinson Santana Townsend served on 6/20/2019. (Wilson, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of Felicia Robinson Webster County Sheriff's Department served on 6/20/2019. (Wilson, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of Felicia Robinson Webster County, Mississippi served on 6/20/2019. (Wilson, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tim Mitchell, Daren Patterson, Santana Townsend, Webster County Sheriff's Department, Webster County, Mississippi. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1690771, filed by Felicia Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - CMS Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Indictment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Webster County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santana Townsend
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Represented By: Jessica S. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Represented By: Jessica S. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daren Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?