Birchfield v. City of West Point, Mississippi
Plaintiff: Jimmy Birchfield
Defendant: City of West Point, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2019cv00152
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Prediscovery Disclosure of Core Information by Berkley N. Huskison on behalf of City of West Point, Mississippi to Plaintiff. (Huskison, Berkley)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Jimmy Birchfield to Defendant. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Resetting Conference: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET for 10/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Jimmy Birchfield City of West Point, Mississippi served on 7/29/2019. (Waide, Jim)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/27/2019. (jf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint (and affirmative defenses) by City of West Point, Mississippi. (Huskison, Berkley)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court docket sheet, #2 Exhibit state court civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit state court complaint, #4 Exhibit letter to state court circuit clerk, #5 Exhibit state court summons, #6 Exhibit complaint filing fee and receipt, #7 Exhibit state court notice of filing of notice of removal) (Huskison, Berkley)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against City of West Point, Mississippi, filed by Jimmy Birchfield. (jla)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of West Point, Mississippi from Clay County Circuit Court, case number 2019-0183C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1711046) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by City of West Point, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birchfield v. City of West Point, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Birchfield
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Ronnie Lee Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Point, Mississippi
Represented By: Berkley N. Huskison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?