Bonner v. Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Alice Bonner
Defendant: Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00171
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2019. Standard Case Management Order not to be entered in this matter. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (jf)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Calvin Paige Herring on behalf of Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated to all counsel of record. (Herring, Calvin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by W. Howard Gunn on behalf of Alice Bonner to Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated. (Gunn, W.)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Austin Hinton on behalf of Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated (Hinton, Brian)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/21/2019. (jf)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated. (Herring, Calvin)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W. Howard Gunn on behalf of Alice Bonner Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated served on 9/28/2019. (Gunn, W.)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated; forwarded to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1723125, filed by Alice Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner v. Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Opportunity, Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Austin Hinton
Represented By: Calvin Paige Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Bonner
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?