Taylor v. State of Mississippi
Petitioner: Thomas Taylor
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2019cv00172
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #9 Order Dismissing Case, Transfer Case to 5th Circuit. (jla)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER transferring petition to U.S. Court of Appeals - 5th Circuit to determine if petitioner is allowed to file successive habeas petition in this court. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 11/5/19. (jla)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Thomas Taylor. (jla)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Letter/Correspondence from Thomas Taylor. (jla)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Taylor. (jla)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #3 Order. (jla)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring the petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit a completed in forma pauperis request including inmate account information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/30/19. (jla)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Lowndes), filed by Thomas Taylor. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?