Garrett v. Papa South, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Garrett
Defendant: Papa South, LLC, F. H. Wiygul, III and Papa John
Case Number: 1:2019cv00174
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Stayed until 1/17/20. Answer due 1/31/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/19/19. (jcm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative,, MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Papa South, LLC, F. H. Wiygul, III. (Hodges, Melissa)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Kimberly Hodges on behalf of Papa South, LLC, F. H. Wiygul, III (Hodges, Melissa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Van Davis Turner, Jr on behalf of Nathan Garrett Papa South, LLC served on 10/28/2019. (Turner, Van)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Papa South, LLC, and F.H. Wiygul, III (jla)
October 11, 2019 Remark; Summons emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Papa South, LLC, F. H. Wiygul, III; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Turner, Van)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H Davidson and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1724418, filed by Nathan Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Papa South, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa South, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. H. Wiygul, III
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Garrett
Represented By: Van Davis Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?