Hebert v. Chickasaw County, Mississippi
Plaintiff: Elise T. Hebert
Defendant: Chickasaw County, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2019cv00175
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chickasaw County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel)
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Chickasaw County, Mississippi (Griffith, Daniel)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Chickasaw County, Mississippi (Griffith, Mary)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Chickasaw County, Mississippi waiver sent on 10/1/2019. (Bennett, Kristy)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal Document [1-2] Exhibit B to the Complaint #1 . Documents containing personal information were inadvertently filed. Correct Exhibit refiled on the docket as Exhibit #3 . No further written order will issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/3/2019. (no document attached) (dbm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint Ex. B by Elise T. Hebert. (Bennett, Kristy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tressa Valentine Johnson on behalf of Elise T. Hebert (Johnson, Tressa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint Corrected Ex. B. (Bennett, Kristy)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chickasaw County, Mississippi; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1724911, filed by Elise T. Hebert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert v. Chickasaw County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chickasaw County, Mississippi
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise T. Hebert
Represented By: Kristy L. Bennett
Represented By: Tressa Valentine Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?