Chandler v. The Hartford
Plaintiff: Nita Michelle Chandler
Defendant: The Hartford
Case Number: 1:2019cv00185
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 8/14/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 2/14/2020. Motions due by 9/15/2020. Settlement Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/11/2019. (jf)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/5/2019. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Nita Michelle Chandler to Defendant. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney William B. Wahlheim, Jr., for the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/27/19. (def)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney William B. Wahlheim, Jr.,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1743806) by The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing TN, #2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing AL) (Cleveland, Ollie)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Cleveland, Ollie)
November 5, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Please file State Court Record for this case (jla)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company on 10/29/2019 by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Nita Michelle Chandler. Waiver of Service due by 11/28/2019. (Waide, Jim)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 11/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/24/2019. (jf)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by The Hartford. (Cleveland, Ollie)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/18/19. (jla)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Cleveland, Ollie)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Nita Michelle Chandler The Hartford served on 10/10/2019. (Waide, Jim)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jtm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against The Hartford, filed by Nita Michelle Chandler. (jtm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Hartford from Circuit Court of Clay County, Mississippi, case number 2019-0225 H. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1729947) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Plan Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. The Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford
Represented By: Ollie A. Cleveland, III
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nita Michelle Chandler
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Ronnie Lee Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?