Prisock et al v. Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reagan Prisock and Robert Prisock
Defendant: Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Ashley Homestore, ABC Corporation (1-10), Jam Enterprises, Inc., John Doe (1-10) and Tempur-Sealy International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00187
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc.. (Rogers, Jennifer)
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Reagan Prisock, Robert Prisock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Reagan Prisock, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Robert Prisock) (Whitehead, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE Cancelling Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before U.S. Magistrate Judge David Sanders. Cancelled pending ruling on #13 Motion to Remand to State Court and Stay lifted. (jf)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time (until 12/19/2019). Reply due by 12/19/2019. No further written order will issue by this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/9/2019. (no document attached)(ray)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Rebuttal by Reagan Prisock, Robert Prisock. (Griffin, Ann)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 JOINDER re #16 Response in Opposition to #13 Motion, #17 Memorandum in Support . (Ayers, David) Modified on 12/6/2019 to link to motion (jwr).
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 Response in Opposition to #13 Motion to Remand. (Ayers, David) Modified on 12/6/2019 to link to motion(jwr).
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of George Keenan) (Ayers, David)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING CASE pending ruling on #13 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/3/19. (jcm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Whitehead, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Reagan Prisock, Robert Prisock. (Whitehead, William)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Kara M.Stewart for the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/19/19. (def)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kara M. Stewart,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1740376) by Ashley Homestore, Jam Enterprises, Inc., Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Ayers, David)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/8/2019. (jf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PLs' Letter to Winston Co Clerk, #3 Exhibit C - Summons - Ashley Homestore, #4 Exhibit D - Summons - JAM Enterprises, #5 Exhibit E - Summons - Tempur Sealy International, #6 Exhibit F - Summons - Tempur-Pedic North America) (Rogers, Jennifer)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David L. Ayers on behalf of Ashley Homestore, Jam Enterprises, Inc., Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. (Ayers, David)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE STATEMENT of JAM Enterprises, Inc. (Rogers, Jennifer)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Tempur Sealy International, Inc. and Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC. (Rogers, Jennifer)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 JAM Enterprises, Inc. ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand , d/b/a Ashley Homestore ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court with Jury Demand by Ashley Homestore, Jam Enterprises, Inc.. (Rogers, Jennifer)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Temper Sealy International, Inc. ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand , Temper-Pedic North America LLC ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court with Jury Demand by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc.. (Rogers, Jennifer)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ann Landgraf Griffin on behalf of Reagan Prisock, Robert Prisock (Griffin, Ann)
October 23, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Prisock, Reagan Prisock. (jwr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. from Circuit Court of Winston County, Mississippi, case number 2019-225. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1731573) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Process & Pleadings Served on Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Keenan, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prisock et al v. Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Rogers
Represented By: David L. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Homestore
Represented By: David L. Ayers
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jam Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Ayers
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempur-Sealy International, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Rogers
Represented By: David L. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reagan Prisock
Represented By: Ann Landgraf Griffin
Represented By: William Arthur Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Prisock
Represented By: Ann Landgraf Griffin
Represented By: William Arthur Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?