Garth et al v. RAC Acceptance East, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Greg Humphrey and Tiffany Garth
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, Fictitious Defendant A, RAC Acceptance East, LLC and Fictitious Defendant B
Case Number: 1:2019cv00192
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Jury Trial by Tiffany Garth, Greg Humphrey. (Comer, Thomas)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Initial Disclosure by Thomas H. Comer, Jr on behalf of Tiffany Garth to Christopher Meyer and Benjamin Coulter, Counsel for Defendant. (Comer, Thomas)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/10/19. (rtc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Trial: Non-Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for May 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/5/19. (rtc)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 6/5/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 1/21/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 3/5/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 4/6/2020. Motions due by 6/26/2020. Settlement Conference set for 5/18/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/5/19. (rtc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 12/5/2019. (rtc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Disclosures by Thomas H. Comer, Jr on behalf of Tiffany Garth to Christopher Meyer and Benjamin Coulter. (Comer, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Christopher D. Meyer on behalf of RAC Acceptance East, LLC to Plaintiffs. (Meyer, Christopher)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Thomas H. Comer, Jr on behalf of Greg Humphrey to Ben Coulter and Christopher Meyer Att for Defendant. (Comer, Thomas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Thomas H. Comer, Jr on behalf of Tiffany Garth to Ben Coulter and Christopher Meyer Att for Defendant. (Comer, Thomas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Certification, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Issued to Rent A Center Franchising International, Inc., #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service on Rent A Center Franchising International, Inc., #5 Exhibit 5 - Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons Issued to RAC Acceptance East, LLC, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Meyer, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by RAC Acceptance East, LLC. (Coulter, Benjamin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin B. Coulter on behalf of RAC Acceptance East, LLC (Coulter, Benjamin)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/28/19. (rtc)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tiffany Garth, Greg Humphrey. (jla)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RAC Acceptance East, LLC from Lee County Circuit Court, case number CV209-00101(M)L. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1732825) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by RAC Acceptance East, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garth et al v. RAC Acceptance East, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fictitious Defendant A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAC Acceptance East, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Meyer
Represented By: Benjamin B. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fictitious Defendant B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Humphrey
Represented By: Thomas H. Comer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Garth
Represented By: Thomas H. Comer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?