Gore v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Lee Gore
Defendant: Shannon Moore and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00200
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Amended Complaint by Tammy Lee Gore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint) (Woodruff, Ronnie)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Substituting Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/10/2020. (jcm)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/3/2020. (jf)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 Defenses and ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Shannon Moore, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Felder, Amy)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Tammy Lee Gore; filed in State Court. (jla)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Certificate, #2 Exhibit "B" Complaint, #3 Exhibit "C" Summons Issued to Wal-Mart, #4 Exhibit "D" Summons Issued to Shannon Moore, #5 Exhibit "E" First Amended Complaint) (Felder, Amy)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Defenses and ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Shannon Moore, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Felder, Amy)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants answer due 11/29/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/19/19. (jcm)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court Unopposed by Shannon Moore, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", Email confirming Plaintiff's agreement to extension) (Felder, Amy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Tammy Lee Gore Shannon Moore served on 10/11/2019. (Waide, Jim)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Tammy Lee Gore Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 10/21/2019. (Waide, Jim)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Shannon Moore, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Tammy Lee Gore. (jla)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Shannon Moore from Monroe County Circuit Court, case number 2019-362-PFM. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1738471) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Shannon Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - All Pleadings, Process and Papers served on Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gore v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Moore
Represented By: Amy Camille Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Camille Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Lee Gore
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Ronnie Lee Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?