Smith v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: James David Smith
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00213
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 1/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/13/2020. (jf)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BNSF Railway Company. (Wheeler, John)
December 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: BNSF Railway Company answer due 12/27/2019. (jla)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/10/19. (def)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by BNSF Railway Company. (Wheeler, John)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John G. Wheeler on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Wheeler, John)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1743361, filed by James David Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James David Smith
Represented By: Charles E. Sorey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: John G. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?