Taylor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Taylor, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00014
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Social Security Hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Greenville Courtroom 2 and the U.S. Attorney's Office before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Concerning Consent to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/19/2020. (irw)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/19/2020. (Attachment: #1 Consent) (irw)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Social Security Transcript by Commissioner of Social Security. (Gough, John)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Gough, John)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/24/2020. (jwr)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to U S Marshal for service. (tab)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue process for the defendant named in the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/23/20. (ncb)
January 23, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth D. Taylor, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Form AO 240) (jla)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth D. Taylor, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Joe Morgan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?