Grooms v. State of Mississippi
Petitioner: John Grooms
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2020cv00036
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Grooms. (cb)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Grooms. (cb) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/9/2020) (cb). Modified on 3/9/2020 (cb).
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (cb) Modified on 2/28/2020 (cb).
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Grooms. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grooms v. State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?