United States of America v. An Easement and Right-Of-Way over 1.02 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Oktibbeha County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: An Easement and Right-Of-Way over 1.02 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Oktibbeha County, Mississippi, Brenda J. Hunt, Elbert J. Day, Jr. and Gary Lynn Day
Case Number: 1:2020cv00047
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Entry of Order for Immediate Possession. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/9/2020. (ray)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession . (Chase, James)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America. (Chase, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ibrahim M. Berro on behalf of United States of America (Berro, Ibrahim)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James S. Chase on behalf of United States of America (Chase, James)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 Letter of Introduction of James S. Chase and Ibrahim M. Berro as counsel for the United States of America. (jwr)
March 25, 2020 DEPOSIT of Funds in the amount of $ 12,500.00, Receipt Number MSN300025723. (tab)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Michael Vincent Bernier on behalf of United States of America OF CONDEMNATION (Attachments: #1 Property Description) (Bernier, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Michael Vincent Bernier on behalf of United States of America of Filing of Declaration of Taking (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taking, #2 Property Description, #3 Map) (Bernier, Michael)
March 18, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. An Easement and Right-Of-Way over 1.02 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Oktibbeha County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-Of-Way over 1.02 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Oktibbeha County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda J. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elbert J. Day, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lynn Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Vincent Bernier
Represented By: James S. Chase
Represented By: Ibrahim M. Berro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?