Hearn v. State of Mississippi, et al
Petitioner: Michael Henry Hearn
Respondent: State of Mississippi and Marshall Turner
Case Number: 1:2020cv00097
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
May 19, 2020 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00023. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 18, 2020 District Transfer Out to the District of Northern District of Mississippi. (PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Transfer order emailed to IT Department for electronic transfer of case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi. (PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF MISSISSIPPI re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Henry Hearn. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 5/18/2020 (PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, the Clerk shall replace Respondent State of Mississippi with Marshall Turner, Superintendent of Mississippi State Penitentiary, Parchman, Mississippi. Marshall Turner added. State of Mississippi terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 5/18/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 16 ATTACHMENT re #15 Response to Order, by Michael Henry Hearn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Response to Order re #11 ORDER, Petitioner directed to complete the attached questionnaire and return the completed signed questionnaire to the Court on or before May 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 4/7/2020. [Copy of Order and questionnaire mailed to petitioner] (LDR) filed by Michael Henry Hearn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave by the Appropriate Courts for Designation of Records by Michael Henry Hearn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION Thru Leave by the Appropriate Courts for Out of Time Appeal by Michael Henry Hearn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 Change of Address filed by Michael Henry Hearn to 34476, 29-B, Parchman, MS 38738, (per envelope. (PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Petitioner directed to complete the attached questionnaire and return the completed signed questionnaire to the Court on or before May 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 4/7/2020. [Copy of Order and questionnaire mailed to petitioner] (LDR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION Thru Leave By The Appropriate Court(s) Appointment of Trial Lawyer, Appearance and Rule 2 (d) by Michael Henry Hearn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION "And Notice Thru Leave by the Appropriate Courts for...Show Cause and Tracking of the Original Filed--in Writ of Habeas Corpus" re #4 Order, by Michael Henry Hearn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, on or before March 19, 2020, Petitioner shall comply with the Court's Order #4 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 2/20/2020. [Copy of Order and Order #4 mailed to petitioner] (LDR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Michael Henry Hearn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 Change of Address filed by Michael Henry Hearn, from 34476, Unit 29-B, Parchman, MS 38738 to 34476, Unit 30-D, Parchman, MS 38738 per envelope attached to #7 (PG) Modified on 2/10/2020 (PG). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Michael Henry Hearn (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, the Clerk is directed to mail to the Petitioner the form used to file a Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Petitioner shall file the Petition on or before February 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 1/14/2020. [Copy of Order and 2254 Petition Form mailed to petitioner] (LDR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 1/14/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Henry Hearn (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Oktibbeha County), filed by Michael Henry Hearn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) (Copy of NEF and Notice mailed(cwl) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/19/2020.] Modified on 5/19/2020 (jla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearn v. State of Mississippi, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marshall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Henry Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?