Bollwitt et al v. Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bollwitt and Jeri Bollwitt
Defendant: ECI HP E-Health (TN), PLLC, NP Tyrone Rupert, John Does 1-10, Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., PA-C Bradley Sumrall, M.D. Keith McCoy, RN Ulanda Robertson, Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc. doing business as Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Bradley Sumrall, PA-C, Tyrone Rupert, NP, Keith McCoy, M.D. and Ulandera Robertson, RN
Case Number: 1:2020cv00112
Filed: May 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ulandera Robertson, RN. (McIntosh, John)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tyrone Rupert, NP. (Graham, Dudley)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bradley Sumrall, PAC. (Graham, Dudley)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Keith McCoy, MD. (Graham, Dudley)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane F. Langston on behalf of Jeri Bollwitt, Michael Bollwitt Tyrone Rupert, NP served on 7/10/2020. (Langston, Shane)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane F. Langston on behalf of Jeri Bollwitt, Michael Bollwitt Ulandera Robertson, RN served on 7/2/2020. (Langston, Shane)
July 8, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #12 Proof of Service of Subpoena; Incorrect event chosen; Please refile as Summons Returned Executed (jla)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA served on Ulandera Robertson by Shane F. Langston on behalf of Jeri Bollwitt, Michael Bollwitt. (Langston, Shane)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Tyrone Rupert, NP; and Ulandera Robertson, RN (jla)
July 8, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Keith McCoy, M.D., Bradley Sumrall, PA-C, ECI HP E-Health (TN), PLLC (jla)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Shane F. Langston on behalf of Jeri Bollwitt, Michael Bollwitt to Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc.. (Langston, Shane)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Walker Upchurch on behalf of Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc. (Upchurch, David)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (McIntosh, John)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc.. (McIntosh, John)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane F. Langston on behalf of Jeri Bollwitt, Michael Bollwitt Keith McCoy, MD served on 6/10/2020. (Langston, Shane)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane F. Langston on behalf of Jeri Bollwitt, Michael Bollwitt ECI HP E-Health (TN), PLLC served on 6/8/2020. (Langston, Shane)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane F. Langston on behalf of Jeri Bollwitt, Michael Bollwitt Bradley Sumrall, PAC served on 6/10/2020. (Langston, Shane)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane F. Langston on behalf of Jeri Bollwitt, Michael Bollwitt Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc. served on 6/10/2020. (Langston, Shane)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., ECI HP E-Health (TN), PLLC, Keith McCoy, MD, Ulandera Robertson, RN, Tyrone Rupert, NP, Bradley Sumrall, PAC. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
June 1, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1811381, filed by Jeri Bollwitt, Michael Bollwitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - iPhone Screenshot, #2 Exhibit B - J Bollwitt Narrative, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollwitt et al v. Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECI HP E-Health (TN), PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Tyrone Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA-C Bradley Sumrall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Keith McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Ulanda Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc. doing business as Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle
Represented By: John Mark McIntosh
Represented By: David Walker Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Sumrall, PA-C
Represented By: Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Rupert, NP
Represented By: Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith McCoy, M.D.
Represented By: Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulandera Robertson, RN
Represented By: John Mark McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bollwitt
Represented By: Rebecca McRae Langston
Represented By: Shane F. Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri Bollwitt
Represented By: Rebecca McRae Langston
Represented By: Shane F. Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?