Blue Canoe, Inc. v. Western World Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Blue Canoe, Inc.
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company and Does 1-3
Case Number: 1:2020cv00134
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/7/20. (cs)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, nunc pro tunc. Answer deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/7/20. (cs)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Western World Insurance Company. (Parker, Myles)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blue Canoe, Inc.. (Spencer, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Parker, Myles)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by Blue Canoe, Inc.. (Greer, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Parker, Myles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Case No. 1:20cv00135-GHD-DAS, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint in Case No. 1:20cv00132-SA-RP, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Docket for Case No. 1:20cv00135-GHD-DAS) (Parker, Myles)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Collins Spencer, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, William)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Greer, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Blue Canoe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Remand) (Greer, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Parker, Myles)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Parker, Myles)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Does 1-3, Western World Insurance Company, filed by Blue Canoe, Inc.. (jla)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Western World Insurance Company from County Court of Lee County, case number CV2020-000528. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1821940) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Suit Service Papers, #3 Exhibit C - Policy No. NPP8647910, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Canoe, Inc. v. Western World Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Canoe, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Greer
Represented By: William Collins Spencer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin Doctor Guyton
Represented By: Allyson Bailey Doran
Represented By: Myles A. Parker
Represented By: Alexandra Francoise Markov
Represented By: Allyson Heine Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?