Wiginton v. Haynie et al
Plaintiff: Billy D. Wiginton
Defendant: Alcorn County, Mississippi and Lonnie Haynie
Case Number: 1:2020cv00171
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/8/2020. (rtc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Brandon Flechas on behalf of Billy D. Wiginton to Arnold Luciano. (Flechas, Brandon)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Core Disclosures by Arnulfo Ursua Luciano on behalf of Alcorn County, Mississippi, Lonnie Haynie to Brandon Flechas, Matthew Grant Dalton, and Philip Andrew Stroud. (Luciano, Arnulfo)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alcorn County, Mississippi, Lonnie Haynie. (Luciano, Arnulfo)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/14/2020. (rtc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Lonnie Haynie waiver sent on 8/13/2020. (Flechas, Brandon)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Alcorn County, Mississippi waiver sent on 8/13/2020. (Flechas, Brandon)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/24/2020. (rtc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arnulfo Ursua Luciano on behalf of Alcorn County, Mississippi, Lonnie Haynie (Luciano, Arnulfo)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Alcorn County, Mississippi, Lonnie Haynie (Griffith, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alcorn County, Mississippi, Lonnie Haynie; forwarded to Attorney for service. (jla)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1839069, filed by Billy D. Wiginton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 12, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiginton v. Haynie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcorn County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Arnulfo Ursua Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Haynie
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Arnulfo Ursua Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy D. Wiginton
Represented By: Matthew Grant Dalton
Represented By: Brandon Flechas
Represented By: Philip Andrew Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?