Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Presly Will Prisock, S. W. P., Laura Hankins Prisock, John Does 1-10 and Nora Lynn Cain
Case Number: 1:2020cv00182
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Rogers, Kevin)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/21/2020. (rtc)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Nora Lynn Cain served on 9/29/2020. (Caraway, Gregg)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America S. W. P. served on 10/1/2020. (Caraway, Gregg)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Presly Will Prisock served on 10/1/2020. (Caraway, Gregg)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Laura Hankins Prisock served on 10/1/2020. (Caraway, Gregg)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by S. W. P., Laura Hankins Prisock, Presly Will Prisock. (Lancaster, Alan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan D. Lancaster on behalf of S. W. P., Laura Hankins Prisock, Presly Will Prisock (Lancaster, Alan)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan D. Lancaster on behalf of Laura Hankins Prisock, Presly Will Prisock (Lancaster, Alan)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/5/2020. (rtc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Safeco Insurance Company of America by Nora Lynn Cain. (Waide, Jim)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Restricted Document: Summons Issued as to SWP. (edc)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nora Lynn Cain, Laura Hankins Prisock, Presly Will Prisock. (edc)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to issue summons under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/11/2020. (yf)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Issue Summons Under Seal by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Rogers, Kevin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1845419, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Safeco Policy, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presly Will Prisock
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. W. P.
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Hankins Prisock
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora Lynn Cain
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Gregg A. Caraway
Represented By: Kevin A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?