Sarlo et al v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lory Sarlo and Michael Sarlo
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00183
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2020 re #8 Order Staying Case. No document attached. (rtc)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING CASE DUE TO BANKRUPTCY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/9/20. (bnd)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc. . (Warren, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/22/2020. (rtc)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Answer due October 9, 2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/22/20. (bnd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Warren, Joseph)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B. Ireland, III on behalf of Michael Sarlo, Lory Sarlo Ruby Tuesday, Inc. served on 9/3/2020. (Ireland, Robert)
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H Davidson and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc. Returned to attorney for service. (tab)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300026443, filed by Michael Sarlo, Lory Sarlo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Single Property Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Tenant Estoppel Certificate, #3 Exhibit C Assignment and Assumption of Lease, #4 Exhibit D Letter Dated 5/21/2020, #5 Exhibit E Letter dated 5/27/2020, #6 Exhibit F Letter dated 7/23/2020, #7 Letter dated 8/7/2020, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarlo et al v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lory Sarlo
Represented By: Robert B. Ireland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sarlo
Represented By: Robert B. Ireland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Lott Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?